Elliott v. Osceola Arkansas, City of
Plaintiff: Gland Elliott
Defendant: Osceola Arkansas, City of and Christopher Ellis
Case Number: 3:2013cv00251
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT: Gland Elliot's claims against the City of Osceola are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Elliot's claims against Christopher Ellis for the July 2013 arrest are dismissed without prejudice as Heck-barred. Ell iott's wrongful-arrest and retaliation claims against Ellis for the February 2013 and March 2014 arrests are dismissed with prejudice. The remainder of Elliot's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/20/2015. (jak)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Elliott's address recently changed again, 40 . The Court directs the Clerk to send Elliott a copy of all findings and the docket sheet to his new address. Because of the change of address, the Court grants Elliott until 13 July 2015 to file any response to the pending Motion to Amend Answer, 39 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2015. (jak)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Elliot's motion for copies, 36 . The Court directs the Clerk to send Elliott a copy of all filings and of the docket sheet. Ellis's motion for extension, 37 , is granted as modified. Any dispositive motion by any party is due by 20 July 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/2/2015. (jak)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a new summons for Christopher Ellis and for the U.S. Marshal to service copies of the Complaint, Amended Complaint, Addendum, and a summons on Ellis without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/2014. (jak)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Elliot copies of this Order, 4 and the docket sheet to both addresses. Elliot's time to file an amended complaint as directed in 4 Order is extended until 21 April 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/2/2014. (jak)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Elliot a copy of 4 Order and the docket sheet. Elliot's time to file an Amended Complaint is extended until 18 April 2014. If he does not do so, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2014. (jak)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER encouraging Plaintiff to familiarize himself with the rules and procedures of the U.S. District Court as well as those outlined within this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2013. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Osceola Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gland Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?