Polston v. Mississippi County Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Delmar Polston
Defendant: Mississippi County Arkansas, Does and Dell Cook
Case Number: 3:2013cv00254
Filed: November 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 6 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice; the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/28/2014. (mmd)
December 24, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must within thirty days of the entry of this Order either pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a properly completed Application. Plaintiff must file an Amended Complaint containing specified information within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/24/2013. (jak)
December 23, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners directing the Plaintiff to follow the rules and procedures in order to proceed with this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/23/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polston v. Mississippi County Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmar Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?