Harding et al v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jonnas Harding and Rodney Harding
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc and John Does
Case Number: 3:2014cv00035
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dollar Tree's motion, 55 . Mr. and Mrs. Harding owe Dollar Tree $1,686.27, which must be paid in full by 10 July 2016. Dollar Tree will forebear any collection effort unless and until payment is not made in full by that date. The Court retains jurisdiction to resolve any later dispute about the costs agreed and awarded. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2015. (jak)
June 19, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court enters judgment on the jury's verdicts for Dollar Tree Stores Inc. on both claims. Dollar Tree may be entitled to costs as allowed by law if it decides to pursue them. Any motion for costs due by 30 June 2015. The Hardings' complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2015. (jak)
June 1, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes BRETT McDANIEL, ROBB HELT, AMELIA MIDDLETON, RICHARD SORIN, and CHRIS COOLEY to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, projector, and personal digital assistant into the E.C. "Took" Gathings Federal Building, 615 South Main, Jonesboro, Arkansas the week of 15 June thru 18 June 2015 for a trial in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding et al v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonnas Harding
Represented By: Brett A. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Harding
Represented By: Brett A. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Represented By: Richard Evan Sorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?