Conway v. Sterrett et al

Plaintiff: Samantha Conway
Defendant: Charles Sterrett and SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00053
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Any and all claims which have been or could have been asserted by Samantha Conway, Conservator, and Next Friend for the Benefit of Thomas Conway and Thomas Conway, Individually, a gainst Defendants Charles Sterrett and Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC, as a result of the alleged motor vehicle accident of September 12, 2012, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The outstanding court costs, if any, are assessed against defendant Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/14/2016. (jak)
October 16, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' joint request, this case is removed from the trial calendar for the week of October 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/16/2015. (jak)
June 11, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion. The Court declines to find the complaint meets any level of immateriality or impertinence at this stage in the proceedings. Therefore, the Court declines to strike the complaint with regard to SAIA. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/11/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. Sterrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Conway
Represented By: Ursula Y. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC
Represented By: Joseph B. Baker
Represented By: Evan Nahmias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?