Mitchell v. Avery Dennison Corp et al

Plaintiff: Sheldon Lee Mitchell
Defendant: Avery Dennison Corp, Epoplex and Traf-Mark Industries LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00058
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing 1 Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/9/2015. (ks)
June 9, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 MOTION to Dismiss. All negligence claims against Traf-Mark are dismissed without prejudice for now. Plaintiff may move to amend his complaint - highlighting and additions and deletions - by 30 June 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/9/2014. (jak)
April 17, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. Mitchell's third cause of action for negligent misrepresentation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Avery Dennison Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Lee Mitchell
Represented By: Michael D. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Dennison Corp
Represented By: Edie R. Ervin
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mountcastle
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Represented By: Gregory A. Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epoplex
Represented By: Gregg R. Brown
Represented By: Paul D. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traf-Mark Industries LLC
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?