Federal Trade Commission v. Abernathy Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Abernathy Motor Company, Wesley Abernathy and David Abernathy
Case Number: 3:2014cv00063
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/23/2015. (ljb)
May 6, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong case). (jak) (The docket text was modified on 5/7/2015.) (thd).
April 22, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/22/2015. (jak)
April 15, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: All deadlines in this case are STAYED until Monday, July 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/15/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Abernathy Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Eric N. Roberson
Represented By: Reid Abram Tepfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abernathy Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?