Perez v. Osceola, City of et al

Plaintiff: Tommy Perez, Jr
Defendant: Osceola, City of, Mike Gibson, Christopher Ellis and David Gladent
Case Number: 3:2014cv00066
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 45 Order, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/10/2015. (jak)
January 30, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a response to defendant's motion for summary judgment, 35 , by Friday, February 6, 2015, or his case shall be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/30/2015. (jak)
June 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining that consolidation of case 3:14-cv-00066 with 3:14-cv-00070 is appropriate. Defendants' 11 Motion for Consolidation is granted. The first filed case is designated as the lead case and all pleadings should be filed in that case. 19 Motion to Amend and 21 Motion for Settlement denied. 23 Motion to Consolidate denied as moot; 20 Motion for Leave to Depose is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/17/2014. (jak)
April 29, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing defendants City of Osceola, Mike Gibson, David Gladent, and Terry Hodges. Service is appropriate for defendant Christopher Ellis. The Clerk shall issue summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons and 6 Amended Complaint on Ellis without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/29/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Osceola, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Perez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gladent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?