Lewis et al v. West Memphis Meadows 1998 Apartments LP et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lewis and Delorise Lewis
Defendant: West Memphis Meadows 1998 Apartments LP, Susquehena Lucas and Johnnie Lee Winkfield
Case Number: 3:2014cv00092
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2015. (jak)
April 13, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting status report and a filing dealing with Ms. Lewis due by 17 April 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/13/2015. (jak)
January 21, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw. Quincey M. Ross is no longer associated with this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/2015. (jak)
December 23, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Joinder. Amended Complaint due by 2 January 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
June 10, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. West Memphis Meadows 1998 Apartments LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis
Represented By: Quincey Maurice Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delorise Lewis
Represented By: Quincey Maurice Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Meadows 1998 Apartments LP
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susquehena Lucas
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Lee Winkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?