Williams v. Craighead County et al

Plaintiff: Randy Williams
Defendant: Bobby Crawford, Craighead County, Matt Hall and Brett Duncan
Case Number: 3:2014cv00127
Filed: May 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Craighead County and Bobby Crawford are dismissed from this action and Plaintiff's cause of action is dismissed without p rejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Dismissal of this action constitutes a "strike". The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/10/2014. (jak)
May 21, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail the Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form along with a copy of this Order. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may do so within thirty days of the date of this Order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/21/2014. (jak)
May 14, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit either the statutory filing fee of $400 or a properly completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, with the required calculation sheet within thirty days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/14/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Craighead County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?