Hampton v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Herman Williett Hampton
Defendant: Marty Boyd, Craighead County Detention Center, Brett Duncan and Bently
Case Number: 3:2014cv00141
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT consistent with 31 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/2015. (jak)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 12 Partial Recommended Disposition. Herman Willett Hampton's claims against the Craighead County Detention Center are dismissed with prejudice. In addition, his claims relating to the Detention Center's grievance procedure and the defendants' failure to respond to his grievances are also dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/3/2014. (jak)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Boyd, Duncan, and Bently. The United States Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, amended complaint, and second amended complaint, with any attachments and a summons for each Defendant through the Craighead County Sheriff's Department without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/4/2014. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bently
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Williett Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?