Tri State Advanced Surgery Center LLC et al v. Health Choice LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tri State Advanced Surgery Center LLC, Glenn A Crosby, II and Michael Hood
Defendant: Health Choice LLC and Cigna Healthcare of Tennessee Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv00143
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/31/2016. (jak)
February 9, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion for Leave to Amend; denying 81 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/9/2016. (jak)
January 13, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 Motion to Seal Document. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to file Health Choice's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, along with the amendment attached to the Reply Memorandum, under seal; Health Choice will file in the public docket a redacted version of the Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/13/2016. (jak)
November 30, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions to Withdraw as Counsel, 114 , 115 , 116 , and 117 . The following individuals are removed as counsel of record for Plaintiff: Joe R. Whatley, Jr., Edith M. Kallas, Deborah J. Winegard, and W. Tucker Brown. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/30/2015. (jak)
November 16, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER, 106 . The trial of this matter (and all other related-pretrial deadlines preceding such trial date) will be reset to a date convenient to the Court no earlier than January 8, 2017. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/16/2015. (jak)
April 20, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: The final paragraph of Order 78 contains a clerical error in that it states that as to Cigna Healthcare of Tennessee Inc., Count II is dismissed without prejudice. This portion of the order is corrected to properly read that it is Count III that is dismissed without prejudice as to this defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/20/2015. (jak)
April 16, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Health Choice LLC. As against this defendant, Count I is dismissed with prejudice, and Counts II, III, and IV are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Cigna Healthcare of Tennessee Inc's motio n to dismiss the complaint, 45 , is granted. As against this defendant, Count I is dismissed with prejudice and Count II is dismissed without prejudice. This resolves all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants. Cigna's counterclaims remain pending at this time. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/16/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri State Advanced Surgery Center LLC et al v. Health Choice LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri State Advanced Surgery Center LLC
Represented By: W. Tucker Brown(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Deborah J. Winegard(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn A Crosby, II
Represented By: W. Tucker Brown(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Deborah J. Winegard(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hood
Represented By: W. Tucker Brown(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Edith M. Kallas(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Deborah J. Winegard(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Choice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Healthcare of Tennessee Inc
Represented By: Warren Haskel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Terence Y. Leong(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ryan D. McEnroe(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Christian Reigstad(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joshua B. Simon(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dmitriy G. Tishyevich(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?