Sellers v. Coca Cola Enterprises Inc et al

Plaintiff: Angella Sellers
Defendant: Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc., Coca Cola Inc, Coca Cola Enterprises Inc, Eric C Yates and John Does
Case Number: 3:2014cv00175
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Sellers's 2 Complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2014. (jak)
August 29, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Remand. Stipulation due by 19 September 2014, so the forum can be settled soon. No new motion to remand is needed. If Sellers caps her damages by stipulation, then the Court will remand sua sponte. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/2014. (jak)
July 22, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting the parties to notify if any reconsideration is desired regarding the recusal issue by 1 August 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Coca Cola Enterprises Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc.
Represented By: Frank L. Day(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca Cola Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca Cola Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric C Yates
Represented By: Frank L. Day(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Steve N. Snyder(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angella Sellers
Represented By: Jerry D. Roberts(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Louis P. Chiozza, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?