Williams v. Moyer et al

Plaintiff: Marlow Williams, Sr
Defendant: Luke Moyer, B McFarland and Marty Boyd
Case Number: 3:2014cv00181
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2015. (jak)
May 8, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send Plaintiff a (freeworld) Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file, within thirty days of the entry of Order, an Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5 (c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/8/2015. (jak)
December 1, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $350 filing fee. The Craighead County Sheriff is directed to collect monthly payments from the plaintiffs institutional account until the full fee has be en paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Sheriff. Plaintiff may proceed with his excessive force claim against Defendants Moyer, McFarland, and Boyd and his retaliation claim against Defendant Moyer. The Cl erk is directed to prepare summons for these Defendants and the U.S. Marshall is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/1/2014. (jak)
November 4, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a prisoner calculation sheet. Plaintiff must within thirty days of the entry of this Order either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner calculation sheet that is signed by an authorized jail official. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/4/2014. (jak)
July 25, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/25/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Moyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlow Williams, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?