King et al v. Homeward Residential Inc et al

Plaintiff: Savoil King and Dorothy King
Defendant: Homeward Residential Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and QBE First Insurance Agency Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv00183
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2017 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 120 Motion for Reconsideration because the defendants have not demonstrated any manifest error of law or fact or presented newly discovered evidence. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/24/2017. (jak)
November 15, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating sua sponte the 98 Order as it was entered in error. The defendants have until 11/23/2016 to respond to the 91 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/15/2016. (jak)
August 19, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 80 Motion for Leave to Amend. Defendants are directed to file an answer to plaintiffs' unjust enrichment claim, 2 , within 14 days of this order. The parties' joint motion for entry of scheduling order, 84 , is granted and a scheduling order will be entered following this order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/19/2016. (jak)
April 13, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 56 Order, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/13/2015. (jak)
November 18, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 and 23 Motions to dismiss as to plaintiffs' ADTPA and unjust enrichment claims, and these claims are dismissed with prejudice. The motion filed by Homeward and Ocwen, 23 , however, is denied as to plaintiffs' breach of contract claim. QBE is therefore dismissed and Homeward and Ocwen remain defendants as to plaintiffs' breach of contract claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/18/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Homeward Residential Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savoil King
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy King
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeward Residential Inc
Represented By: Ryan A. Becker
Represented By: Stephen R. Blacklocks
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Brian V. Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Ryan A. Becker
Represented By: Stephen R. Blacklocks
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Brian V. Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE First Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: Katherine L. Halliday
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Megan Perkins Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?