Howard v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company et al

Plaintiff: Robert C Howard
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company and John Does
Case Number: 3:2014cv00202
Filed: July 22, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 85 Stipulation, this action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter a satisfaction of judgment and to refund the cash bond previously deposited with the Clerk of Court by Nucor-Yamato Steel Company (Limited Partnership). Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/2016. (jak)
February 22, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Nucor's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law, or in the alternative, a motion for a new trial, 70 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/2016. (jak)
November 19, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Nucor-Yamato Steel Company's motion for leave to file a reply, 77 . The reply must be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. After reviewing all of the arguments in support of and against the renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law or in the alternative for new trial, the Court will decide whether oral argument would be beneficial and will notify the parties accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/19/2015. (jak)
October 30, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 MOTION to Stay. Provided that the cash bond remains on file with the Clerk of Court, all garnishment and execution will be stayed pending resolution of the renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law or in the alternative for a new trial and all appeals. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/30/2015. (jak)
October 28, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 68 Opinion and Order, Judgment is entered in favor of Robert C. Howard against Nucor-Yamato Steel Company for costs in the amount of $6,560.03. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/2015. (jak)
October 21, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Stay, provided that Nucor posts a cash bond in the amount of $288,569.92 by 5:00 p.m. on October 22, 2015. The stay will expire at 5:00 p.m. on October 29, 2015, unless Nucor files a notice of appeal, in which case the stay will continue in effect pending appeal. Howard's applications for writ of garnishment and for execution are denied at this time. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/21/2015. (jak)
October 1, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Robert C. Howard against Nucor-Yamato Steel Company in the amount of Two Hundred Eighty-Eight Thousand Four Hundred Ninety-Two Dollars ($288,492) plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.34% per annum and costs of the action, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2015. (jak)
September 24, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion in Limine; denying 19 Motion in Limine; and granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/24/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Howard
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?