Perez v. Cook et al

Plaintiff: Tommy Perez, Jr
Defendant: Dale Cook, Glaudia Yancey, Clayborne Hicks and Mississippi County
Case Number: 3:2014cv00203
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Perez's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2015. (jak)
February 13, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an updated Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within fifteen days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall forward an in forma pauperis application to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/13/2015. (jak)
January 12, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Recommendation and overruling Perez's objection, 31 . Perez's motion for order, which the Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunction, 22 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
December 19, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff a copy of 25 and this Order to Perez's new address. Any objections to the recommendations must be filed by 5 January 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2014. (jak)
October 1, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants Cook, Hicks, and Mississippi County Defendants are dismissed from this action. Perez's harassment and gender discrimination claims against Yancey are dismissed without prejudice. Motion to Amend, 6 , denied. Perez's race discrimination claim against Yancey remains. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/2014. (jak)
September 17, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/17/2014. (jak)
September 8, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Amend. Service is appropriate for the Defendant Glaudia Yancey. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the defendant and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint, Supplement, and su mmons on Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. The Clerk shall docket entry 5 as an Amended Complaint and docket entry 8 as a Supplement to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/8/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Perez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaudia Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayborne Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?