McKinney v. Metal Services LLC

Plaintiff: M Kathleen McKinney
Defendant: Metal Services LLC
Amicus: USW
Case Number: 3:2014cv00211
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:160
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the 8 December 2014 hearing, Metal Services's motion to strike, 23 , is denied, and the Board's petition, 1 , joined by the Union, is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/8/2014. (jak)
September 23, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noting the Clerk's report from the parties regarding waivers of disqualification. 3 Motion granted as modified. We'll proceed on the administrative record and affidavits from both sides. A prompt oral argument on the petition will be scheduled. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/23/2014. (jak)
September 9, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to file the National Labor Relations Board letter brief and the proof of service. This service was satisfactory notice under the statute, and the Court confirms it. The Court orders the Board to serve this Order immediately on all interested parties by U.S. mail and email (if possible), and file proof of service. Metal Services must respond to the petition and motion by 26 September 2014. The Board may reply by 3 October 2014. There is a recusal issue. Each party must n otify the Clerk of Court in writing by 19 September 2014 that it waives disqualification based on my prior representation of Nucor entities otherwise recusal shall occur. Please do not send me a copy of your letter to the Clerk. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Metal Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Services LLC
Represented By: William Christopher Harrison(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Kathleen McKinney
Represented By: Beauford D. Pines(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: USW
Represented By: Bruce Fickman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas H. McGowan(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?