Wilkes v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company

Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Petitioner: Etter Wilkes
Case Number: 3:2014cv00224
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion. A new trial date, including and amended scheduling order, will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/2016. (jak)
September 29, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Nucor's motion and dismisses with prejudice any Title VII and ADA claims based on Ms. Wilkes's termination for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Court denies Nucor's motion in all other respects. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/29/2015. (jak)
November 12, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Ms. Wilkes is directed to submit the full $400 filing fee within 60 days of the date of this Order. Her failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of her complaint with out prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). The Court denies 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The Court grants 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Wilkes shall have up to and including December 4, 2014, to file her responses to defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Ms. Wilkes. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/12/2014. (jak)
September 23, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER provisionally granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis pursuant to General Order 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/23/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkes v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Etter Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Guerra
Represented By: Jeff S. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?