Sumpter v. Crittenden Hospital Association et al

Plaintiff: Deloris Sumpter
Defendant: Crittenden Hospital Association, Gene Cashman, David Raines, Brad McCormick, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Co and Cigna Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv00229
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2016 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Mr. Edwards, or one of Goodman's several able lawyers, should depose Mr. Baytos on one of the dates most convenient to Mr. Baytos. If that deposition turns up a few more folks who need deposing, the parties should propose a joint solution on how to accomplish this as soon as practicable notwithstanding the discovery cutoff. Joint report, 141 addressed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2016. (jak)
February 11, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Agreed notice, 113 , appreciated and approved with the attached tweaks. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/11/2016. (jak)
February 9, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the reasons stated on the record at the 5 February 2016 status conference, the Court orders the following: An amended final scheduling order will issue. The Court also orders these deadlines: 10 February 2016 - the parties must submit agree d proposed class notice to the Court. 12 February 2016 - the Hospital must identify any withheld privileged materials and produce a privilege log. 12 February 2016 - Goodman must deliver search terms for Cashman, Tant, and McCormick email accounts to Hospital. 26 February 2016 - Hospital and Cigna must provide Goodman whatever information on the class members' contact information. 26 February 2016 - Hospital must tell Goodman whether old servers contain email boxes from any other named defe ndant and the amount of data and cost to recover it. 26 February 2016 - Goodman must resolve Methodist discovery issues or tee-up subpoena/motion for protective order for decision. 26 February 2016 - Goodman must tell the Court and other parties abou t status of her common law claims. 4 March 2016 - Deadline for defendants to propound discovery. 11 March 2016 - Hospital must produce emails from data available as of 5 February 2016. Goodman's WARN Act claim is dismissed without prejudice. Goodman's claims against Donna Lanier and Carol McCormack are also dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/9/2016. (jak)
November 12, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Cigna's motion to dismiss, 69 . Methodist's motion to dismiss, 61 , is granted. Goodman's constructive fraud claim under Arkansas law against Cigna is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/12/2015. (jak)
August 31, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 89 Motion to Compel based on counsel's attached letter, which the Court appreciates. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2015. (jak)
March 13, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Clerk's 10 March 2015 report noted and appreciated. Because of all the parties' waivers, I will stay on the case. I look forward to continuing to work with all counsel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/2015. (jak)
January 23, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2015. (jak)
January 21, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs to file a consolidated amended complaint by 9 February 2015. The stay will dissolve on 10 February 2015. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond by 11 March 2015. The motion for class certification, or a stipulation, is due by 30 June 2015. Phase 1 discovery, focusing on class issues and the merits, will end on 18 September 2015. The Court will hold another status conference in August or September. Trial is set for 8 February 2016. A Final Scheduling Order will iss ue. An amended Order with all pretrial deadlines will issue after the Court sees where the case stands in September. The Court approves the proposed protective Orders with a few changes attached hereto. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/2015. (jak)
January 16, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint status report, 43 , noted and appreciated. The Court applauds the progress to date. Press on. The Court looks forward to learning about more good developments next week. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/16/2015. (jak)
December 15, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the 12 December 2014 hearing, the Court makes the following rulings. Motions to consolidate and continue, 23 , granted as modified. Motion to dismiss, 28 , denied as moot. Motion to withdraw, 31 , gra nted. Motion to dismiss, 33 , denied as moot. Amended Complaint, 37 , construed as a motion for leave to amend is granted. The Court designates Sumpter, Case No. 3:14-cv-229 as the lead case because it was filed first, albeit in state court. The Court will hold another Rule 16(a) status conference at 1:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 21 January 2015 in Jonesboro. Joint status report due by 14 January 2015. Case stayed until 10 February 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/15/2014. (jak)
December 4, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying 32 Order regarding the 12 December 2014 hearing. The Court will address all pending motions in both cases. The expedited schedule allows adequate time for responsive filings. While the Court often benefits from replies, the Rules of Civil Procedure do not mandate them; and all parties will be heard fully at the hearing in any event. The Court invites all counsel to the hearing, but only one lawyer for each party must attend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/4/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumpter v. Crittenden Hospital Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Sumpter
Represented By: Roger Dennis Sumpter, II(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden Hospital Association
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Cashman
Represented By: John I. Houseal, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Raines
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad McCormick
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: Peter E. Pederson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: Peter E. Pederson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?