Cade v. Pritchett Inc et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Cade, Jr
Defendant: Pritchett Inc and Constance Pritchett
Case Number: 3:2014cv00239
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/30/2015. (jak)
July 23, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: At the parties' joint request, the Court has reconsidered the settlement-approval issue. After reconsideration, the Court reaffirms its earlier Order requiring judicial approval of the parties' proposed compromise. The parties' proposed settlements are fair and reasonable, 22 . The settlements are approved except for the confidentiality provision. The Court will unseal the settlement agreements, and enter Judgment dismissing the case, unless a party files notice by 29 Jul y 2015 that the lack of confidentiality is a deal breaker. If so, the case will move forward for resolution on the merits. Counsels's time records will remain sealed whether the settlement holds or not. Joint motion, 23 , denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/23/2015. (jak)
June 23, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes the parties' joint motion to dismiss, 18 . Before the Court can enter judgment, it must approve the parties' proposed agreement because this is a FLSA case. Proposed agreement, and any billing records for attorney's fees, must be filed under seal by 29 June 2015. The Court will probably unseal the agreement in due course. If the parties object to that, they should explain why. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/23/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cade v. Pritchett Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Cade, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W. Espy(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchett Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?