Barton et al v. Kees et al

Plaintiff: Jenny Barton, Christian Taylor, Libby Wilhite and Veronica Thomas
Defendant: Stafford Kees and Stafford Kees, Jr
Case Number: 3:2014cv00241
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status reports, 24 & 25 noted and appreciated. Kees's bankruptcy means this case is stayed as of 12 October 2015 and it is administratively terminated. Kees must keep the Court informed about the status of his bankruptcy. Status report due 1 December 2016. The Court will lift the stay, and dismiss this case without prejudice, if no action is taken by 1 August 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2016. (jak)
February 1, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report by 10 February 2016. If the plaintiffs have personal email addresses, they should file them with the Court by 10 February 2016. And the Court directs Keys to serve all future filings on plaintiffs at those email addresses, and by U.S. mail, and to so certify in his future papers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2016. (jak)
February 3, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 13 Motion for Entry of Default. The Court directs the Clerk to put page seven under seal of docket entry 4 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/3/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton et al v. Kees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libby Wilhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford Kees, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?