Brown et al v. Scharphorn et al
Plaintiff: Mark Brown and Robin Brown
Defendant: Kevin Scharphorn and Rush Trucking Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv00250
Filed: October 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion. All claims in this matter are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/2017. (jak)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Court hereby grants 57 Motion, and orders all claims by Plaintiffs, Mark Brown and Robin Brown, be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/13/2017. (jak)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The 9/25/2017 jury trial is removed from the Court's docket. The parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed final order of dismissal upon finalization of the settlement. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2017. (jak)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER grating 39 and 40 Motions. The plaintiffs must file the amended complaint within seven days from the entry of this Order. The defendants must file the amended answer within seven days after the amended complaint is filed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/28/2017. (jak)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying as moot 33 and 34 Motions as the issues raised have been resolved by the parties. The hearing scheduled for 9:00 a.m., on Tuesday, June 27, 2017, is cancelled. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/26/2017. (jak)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The moving parties must confer in good faith with the party who issued the subpoena and provide a certificate by 3:00 p.m. on 6/26/2017. If the plaintiffs oppose the motions to quash or for a protective order, a written response to the motions must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 6/26/2017. If no written response is filed by that time, the Court will assume that the plaintiffs do not object to the motions and will therefore grant the motions and cancel the hearing. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/23/2017. (jak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Intervene. Bridgefield must file its complaint in intervention within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/28/2016. (jak)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion to continue trial. This matter is removed from the trial docket for the week of September 26, 2016. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/9/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Scharphorn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Brown
Represented By: Brett A. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Brown
Represented By: Brett A. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Scharphorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Trucking Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?