Robinson v. Nucor Corporation

Plaintiff: Kenneth Robinson
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv00267
Filed: November 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 43 Opinion and Order, judgment is entered in favor of Nucor Corporation, d/b/a Nucor Steel, on the claims of Kenneth Robinson. The complaint of Kenneth Robinson is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/2016. (jak)
September 9, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of time to file reply. Nucor's reply must be filed on or before 9/20/2016. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/9/2016. (jak)
August 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Continue. This matter is removed from the trial docket for the week of September 26, 2016. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/15/2016. (jak)
July 7, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Joint MOTION to Extend Time. The scheduling order previously entered is set aside, and this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of September 28, 2015. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/7/2015. (jak)
December 29, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/29/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Nucor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Robinson
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Jeff S. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?