Addison v. Cox et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Susan Cox, Jerry Martin and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 3:2014cv00272
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 21 order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/2015. (ks)
December 29, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety in all respects. Mr. Addison's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/29/2014. (jak)
November 20, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Denying 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff an IFP Application along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/20/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?