Hogland et al v. Town & Country Grocer of Fredericktown Missouri Inc

Plaintiff: Kerry Hogland
Defendant: Town & Country Grocer of Fredericktown Missouri Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv00273
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2015 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion for Costs. The Court awards Hogland $30,194.28 in costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920 and Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/7/2015. (jak)
September 1, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for Town & Country to provide the Court and Mr. Dreyer, within seven days from the entry of this Order, the specific questions that they propose to ask those jurors who may be willing to talk with them about the case. Mr. Drey er will be allowed fourteen days to make objections to those questions. The Court will then review the proposed questions, along with any objections, and let Town & Country's counsel know whether they may ask all or only some of those questions. Second, the Court will writ each juror a letter informing that about the questions and inquire whether they desire to to talk with Town & Country's counsel. If the jurors are willing to talk, they should contact Shauna Bostic and let her know t he time of day and phone number they prefer to be contacted. Once this information is received by Ms. Bostic, counsel for Town & Country can contact only those jurors who have indicated a willingness to talk with them about the case. The only questions that Town & Country's counsel can ask those jurors are the ones previously approved by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/1/2015. (jak)
August 24, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Kerry Hogland against Town & Country Grocer of Fredericktown Missouri Inc in the amount of $8,714,790.88. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Hunter Trevillion, and against Defendant Town & Country Grocer of Fredericktown Missouri, Incorporated, in the amount of $475,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/24/2015. (jak)
July 10, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/10/2015. (jak)
June 22, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting part and denying in part 36 Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony. Town & Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion are granted only as to Dr. Johnson's third recommendation, for speech thera py, contained in his November 25, 2014 Report. The remainder of Town & Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion is denied. Town & Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Irmo Marini, Ph.D. 34 are granted in part and denied in part. Town & Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion are granted as to: (1) Dr. Marini's "career mobility" theory as a basis for calculating Hogland's future lost earnings; (2) item (5) &q uot;speech language therapy" in the section of Dr. Marini's Life-Care Plan captioned "Projected Therapeutic Modalities", and (3) everything in the final section of Dr. Marini's Life-Care Plan captioned "Future Medical Care - Routine Evaluations." The remainder of Town and Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion is denied. Town and Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Lonnie Talbert, Ph.D. 32 are granted in part and denied in part. Town & Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion are granted as to Dr. Talbert's calculation of Hogland's future lost earnings based on Dr. Marini's "career mobility" theory. The remainder of Town & Country's Motion in Limine and Daubert Motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/22/2015. (jak)
June 9, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff Charles Hogland's claim is dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/9/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogland et al v. Town & Country Grocer of Fredericktown Missouri Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Hogland
Represented By: Roger A. Dreyer
Represented By: Brett A. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town & Country Grocer of Fredericktown Missouri Inc
Represented By: Jonathan E. Baker
Represented By: Stephen W. Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?