Kennedy v. Poinsett County Jail

Plaintiff: Bart A Kennedy
Defendant: Poinsett County Jail
Case Number: 3:2014cv00287
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Kennedy's claims against Poinsett County Jail are dismissed with prejudice. Kennedy's claims against Mills are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (ks)
July 10, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice of his current mailing address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff at the Cummins Unit as well as to him at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/10/2015. (jak)
February 12, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Recommendation. Poinsett County Jail is dismissed with prejudice as a defendant. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2015. (jak)
January 20, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service of the amended complaint, 5 , is appropriate and directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the amended complaint, this order, and summons, upon Mills, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 4 , denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/20/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Poinsett County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart A Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?