Dixion v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius Dixion
Defendant: Mike Allen, Robert Coleman, Terrea Bohner and Davis
Case Number: 3:2014cv00301
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Dixon's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/5/2016. (jak)
November 10, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Dixon to notify the Court of his new address within thirty days of entry of this Order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of his lawsuit under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/10/2015. (jak)
August 19, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Dixon to ascertain a valid service address for Defendant Davis and file a Motion for Service by September 21, 2015. Mr. Dixon may use the discovery process set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for example Rule 33, t o find Mr. Davis's address; or he may use other means. But, Mr. Dixon is warned that if he does not comply with this Order, claims against Defendant Davis will be dismissed, without prejudice. Mr. Dixon is further instructed not to file discovery requests or responses with the Court unless they are necessary to support a motion or response to a motion, or to comply with a court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/19/2015. (jak)
August 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Davis, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve Defendant Davis with a summons and a copy of the 2 Complaint without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor at the address provided under seal. Importantly, the Defendant's private mailing address must be redacted from the return of service and any other public portion of the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/4/2015. (jak)
July 20, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 16 Motion to Compel. The Warden of the Crittenden County Jail is ordered to provide the Court the last known address for Officer Davis, under seal, or explain why he is unable to do so within 14 days. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Crittenden County Jail, 350 AFCO Road, West Memphis, AR, 72301. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/20/2015. (jak)
June 3, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to ascertain a valid service address for Davis within forty-five days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order may result in dismissal, without prejudice, of the claims against Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/3/2015. (jak)
April 20, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Coleman, Bohner, and Allen as defendants. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Davis and Childress. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them w ithout prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. If either of the defendants is no longer a county employee, the individual responding to service must file the unserved defendant's last known private mailing address under seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2015. (jak)
December 17, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/17/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixion v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Dixion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrea Bohner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?