Valley View Agri LLC v. Producers Cooperative Oil Mill

Plaintiff: Valley View Agri LLC
Defendant: Producers Cooperative Oil Mill
Case Number: 3:2014cv00307
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 39 Opinion and Order, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/26/2015. (jak)
October 19, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion. The motion to strike is denied. The motion for leave to file a sur-reply is granted. Valley View's sur-reply must be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/19/2015. (jak)
June 8, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Compel. The Court orders that the documents and any other responsive information be produced before the deposition scheduled for June 18, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/8/2015. (jak)
May 21, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Producers Cooperative Oil Mill to file its response to the plaintiff's motion to compel jurisdictional discovery on or before May 27, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/21/2015. (jak)
February 26, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss as to the right of Producers Coop to renew the motion following discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction. Valley view will be given a period of ninety days from the date of the entry of this Order to conduct discovery tailored to the issue of whether Producers Coop is subject to personal jurisdiction in the State of Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/26/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley View Agri LLC v. Producers Cooperative Oil Mill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley View Agri LLC
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ralph W. Waddell(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Producers Cooperative Oil Mill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?