Hollis et al v. Kaplan et al

Plaintiff: Stephen E Hollis and Christy Hollis
Defendant: Bertram D Kaplan, Bertram D Kaplan MD PLLC, Andrew Kanik, CBLPath Inc, CBLPath Holdings Corporation, CBLPath Transport Inc and John Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv00005
Filed: January 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties in this case notified the Court that they have reached a settlement. The Court removes this case from the trial docket for the week of September 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/13/2016. (jak)
March 14, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. Mr. Kanik, CBLPath Inc; CBLPath Holdings Corporation; and CBLPath Transport, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice as defendants from this action. For good cause shown, Mr. and Mrs. Hollis's motion for an extension of time is granted, 25 . Mr. and Mrs. Hollis have up to and including March 17, 2016, to file supplemental expert disclosures for Dr. Moshell and Dr. Harrison. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/14/2016. (jak)
September 22, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion for More Definite Statement, Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/22/2015. (jak)
February 26, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice plaintiffs' claims against CBLPATH Holdings Corporation and CBLPath Transport Inc. Each of these parties will bear their own costs and fees incurred in the litigation. This Order does not affect or involve the plaintiffs' claims against the other named defendants in this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/26/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollis et al v. Kaplan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E Hollis
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Hollis
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertram D Kaplan
Represented By: Claire M. Cissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertram D Kaplan MD PLLC
Represented By: Claire M. Cissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kanik
Represented By: Paul D. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBLPath Inc
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: Eric Reif Gribble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBLPath Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: Eric Reif Gribble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBLPath Transport Inc
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: Eric Reif Gribble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?