Rupert v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Prentis Rupert
Defendant: Larry Mills and Susan Cox
Case Number: 3:2015cv00022
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Attorney Fees. Accordingly, defendant Larry Mills, in his official capacity, is ordered to pay Ruperts attorney fees in the amount of $8,625 and his litigations costs in the amount of $861.56. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/20/2016. (jak)
September 2, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 79 Verdict that on plaintiff Prentis Rupert's due process claim against defendant Larry Mills, in his official capacity, judgment is rendered for Rupert and Rupert shall recover from Poinsett County, Arkansas damages in t he amount of $5,750. Rupert shall have 14 days in which to file his motion for costs and Larry Mills shall have 7 days to respond. It is ordered that, on Ruperts due process claim against Mills, in his individual capacity, judgment is rendered for Mills and Rupert's claim is dismissed with prejudice. It is ordered that, on Rupert's deliberate indifference claim against defendant Susan Cox, judgment is rendered for Cox and Rupert's claim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/2016. (jak)
December 16, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion. In conformity with Rule 83.7 of the Local Rules for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas, Lee J. Muldrow, Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, 200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201, 501-371-080 8, is hereby appointed to represent Mr. Rupert. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Mr. Muldrow a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Under Local Rule 83.7, counsel must make written application to withdraw within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, if there is cause to withdraw; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/16/2015. (jak)
November 20, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Judge Miller has denied summary judgment as to Mr. Rupert's deliberate-indifference claim against Defendant Cox and his due process claim against Defendant Mills. A bench trial setting before Judge Miller is now in order. The undersigned will continue to handle pretrial matters until three weeks prior to trial, or as requested by Judge Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/20/2015. (jak)
November 3, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion for summary judgment, 27 filed by Defendants Cox and Mills is granted on Rupert's deliberate indifference claim with regards to his dental care and that claim is dismissed with prejudi ce, and denied on Rupert's deliberate indifference claim against Cox with regards to his hepatitis C. Summary judgment, 27 , is granted on Rupert's due process claim against Cox and that claim is dismissed with prejudice, and denied on Rup ert's due process claim against Mills. The motion for summary judgment, 46 , filed defendants Wendy Kelley and Rory Griffin is granted and Rupert's claims against these defendants are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Kelley and Griffin as party defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/2015. (jak)
August 24, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Kelley, Griffin, and Redick-Young. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, with any attachments, 2 and 38 , and summonses for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/24/2015. (jak)
May 12, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 partial recommended disposition in all respects. Defendants' motion for partial judgment on the pleadings 11 is granted in part and denied in part. Accordingly: Rupert's claims regarding the denial of access to the law library, the detention center's lock-down policy, and the opportunity to participate in yard call are dismissed without prejudice. Rupert may proceed on his due process claim, and on his claims that defendants provided him inadequate hepatitis-C and dental treatment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/12/2015. (jak)
January 26, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for each of the named defendants. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, 2 , and summons for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/26/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupert v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentis Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?