McMinn v. Greene County Jail et al

Plaintiff: William Keith McMinn, Jr
Defendant: Blanchard, Greene County Detention Center and Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv00025
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice McMinn's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/23/2015. (jak)
April 27, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide, no later than 30 days after this Order's entry date, his current mailing address. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/27/2015. (jak)
April 10, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed recommendation, 5 . Grievance-process and law-library claims dismissed without prejudice. All claims against the Greene County Detention Center are dismissed without prejudice and the Center is dismissed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)
January 28, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate. No later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff must submit the full $400.00 filing and administrative fees, or file a fully completed and signed in forma pauperis application, along with the trust fund calculation sheet and certificate. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/28/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMinn v. Greene County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Keith McMinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?