Williams v. Does

Plaintiff: Laneshia Williams
Defendant: Does and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00045
Filed: February 10, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/2015. (jak)
April 27, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide to the Court additional identifying information about Nurse Tammy and other Doe Defendants within forty-five days of the date of this Order. Failure to provide such may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/27/2015. (jak)
February 13, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis together with an Amended Complaint, within thirty days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an IFP Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet and a § 1983 Complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/13/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laneshia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?