Brewer v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brewer and Bryce Brewer
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2015cv00049
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 CASE FILE NOTE: #9 Administrative Transcript maintained as a material record and sent to the National Records Center (Accession 021-22-0065, Box 28). The remainder of the file is maintained as an electronic record. (ade)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Fees and expenses totaling $2,704.12 are awarded to Brewer. Because the award belongs to Brewer, and not his attorney, the Department of Treasury shall issue payment of this award by check made payable to Brewer, in care of his attorney, Anthony W. Bartels, and shall mail the check to Bartels at his Jonesboro, Arkansas, address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/13/2015. (jak)
November 12, 2015 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to EAJA filed by Social Security Administration. (Newman, Melinda)
October 28, 2015 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to EAJA filed by Bryce Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bartels, Anthony)
October 28, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to EAJA by Bryce Brewer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bartels, Anthony)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT pursuant to #15 Order, this case is remanded for further proceedings. This is a "sentence four" remand within the meaning of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and Melkonyan v. Sullivan, 501 U.S. 89 (1991). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/27/2015. (jak)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER reversing and remanding the final decision of the Commissioner. This remand is a "sentence four" remand within the meaning of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and Melkonyan v. Sullivan, 501 U.S. 89 (1991). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/27/2015. (jak)
August 10, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/10/2015. (thd)
July 24, 2015 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (Newman, Melinda)
July 24, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda R. Newman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Newman, Melinda)
June 12, 2015 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Bryce Brewer. Defendant Brief due by 7/27/2015 (Bartels, Anthony)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Brief due by 6/11/2015. Defendant's Brief due within 42 days of the date Plaintiff's Brief is served. Signed by L. Coleman at the Direction of the Court on 04/30/2015. (lmc)
April 27, 2015 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no .pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re #7 Answer to Complaint and #8 Notice (Other). Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (rhm) (Documents w/restricted access added on 04/27/2015 for review by Court users only.) (rhm)
April 24, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE by Social Security Administration of conventional filing of the administrative transcript (Tucker, Eric)
April 24, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Tucker, Eric)
April 1, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/1/2015. (thd)
March 18, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
February 27, 2015 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge H. David Young. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/27/2015. (jak)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/18/2015. (lej)
February 18, 2015 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Bryce Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryce Brewer. (jak)
February 18, 2015 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Brewer
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melinda R. Newman
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?