Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc v. Rural King Holding Co

Plaintiff: Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc
Defendant: Rural King Holding Co
Case Number: 3:2015cv00051
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the jury trial in this case scheduled for the week of 4/3/2017. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/2017. (jak)
August 17, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Continuance. This matter is removed from the trial docket for the week of September 26, 2016. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/2016. (jak)
November 30, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Compel. Rural King Holding Co. must answer the interrogatories and produce the requested documents by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, December 7, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/30/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc v. Rural King Holding Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc
Represented By: Gary N. Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural King Holding Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?