Hamilton v. Hitt et al

Plaintiff: Houston Clay Hamilton
Defendant: Becky Hitt, Susan Cox and Larry Mills
Case Number: 3:2015cv00055
Filed: February 25, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion for Discovery. The defendants may depose plaintiff at a mutually agreed upon date, time, and place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/18/2017. (jak)
October 7, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER encouraging the parties to consider consenting to a trial before the Magistrate Judge. It's entirely up to the parties; but the Court highlights this option out of respect for the parties' time. The Court directs the Clerk to send the parties another set of consent forms. The deadline for returning the forms is 11/4/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2016. (jak)
January 13, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an IFP application to plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the $350 filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application, and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/13/2016. (jak)
December 8, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide notice of his current address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to comply will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record as well as the Cummins Modular Unit. Mail sent to the Cummins Modular Unit should include Plaintiff's ADC number of 654768, as set forth in his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/8/2015. (jak)
October 27, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide a notice of his current address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Hitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Clay Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?