Addison v. Galoway et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Jimmy Galoway, Ben Bristow, Claudia Mattews, Misty Richardson and Poinsett County, Arkansas Circuit Court
Case Number: 3:2015cv00069
Filed: March 18, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Addison's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2015. (jak)
June 12, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Discovery without prejudice. This case was stayed 27 April 2015 pending resolution of Addison's state criminal case, 4 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2015. (jak)
April 27, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Addison must pay the $350 filing fee. The Court directs his current custodian to collect an initial partial filing fee of $1.62 from plaintiff's prison trust account and forward t he amount along with future monthly payments to the Clerk of Court. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Sheriff of Poinsett County. This case is stayed pending disposition of State of Arkansas v. Nicholas Addison, Case No . CR-2014-392. Either party may file a motion to reopen this case within sixty days after the final disposition of the state court action, including any appeal. If neither party files a timely motion to reopen or seeks any relief by 9 May 2016, the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to administratively terminate this case for now. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Galoway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Galoway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bristow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Mattews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County, Arkansas Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?