Helena Chemical Company v. Baratti et al

Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Defendant: Joe Baratti, Jr, Joe Baratti, Sr and Baratti Farms
Case Number: 3:2015cv00077
Filed: March 20, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Stipulation, 37 , noted, appreciated, and approved. The automatic stay remains in effect as to Joe Baratti, Sr. Execution on the judgment, 28 , is not stayed against Baratti Farms. The Court orders First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas to pay to Helena Chemical the identified amount in the Baratti Farms account. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2016. (jak)
November 30, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting unopposed motion to stay and compel arbitration, 15 . The motion for summary judgment, 12 , is denied without prejudice. The dispute remains stayed as to Baratti Jr. because of his bankruptcy. Joint status report due 1 January 2016, and every six months thereafter. Case stayed and administratively terminated, as to all parties. Any party may move to reopen, and confirm or challenge, any arbitration award. If no party seeks relief by 1 December 2017, the Court will reopen and dismiss the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' stipulation, 10 . THis case remains stayed as to Joe Baratti, Jr., but will continue against Joe Baratti, Sr. and Baratti Farms. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2015. (jak)
September 8, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying this case as to Joe Baratti Jr. On the current record, the Court can't discern whether the stay extends to the partnership. The case will continue for sure against Joe Baratti, Sr. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Chemical Company v. Baratti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Baratti, Jr
Represented By: Bart Edmond Ziegenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Baratti, Sr
Represented By: Bart Edmond Ziegenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baratti Farms
Represented By: Bart Edmond Ziegenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?