James v. Duncan et al

Plaintiff: Tarone L James
Defendant: Art Bentley, Chaisity Jackson and Tracy Reese
Case Number: 3:2015cv00080
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: James's claim that he was improperly charged for medical services is dismissed with prejudice. James's other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/26/2016. (jak)
November 23, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to forward a copy of 22 Order to Mr. James at the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Mr. James may have until December 23, 2015, to respond to the Defendants' discovery requests, as required by the Court's Order 22 , and to notify the Court of his current address. In addition, Defendants are instructed to notify the Court whether Mr. James has provided the discovery responses at issue by December 18, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/23/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Compel. Mr. James has until November 12, 2015, to respond to the discovery requests at issue. If he fails to comply with this Order, he risks having some or all of his claims dismissed, without prejudice. The 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied for reasons explained in a previous order, 2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/14/2015. (jak)
May 11, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed partial recommendation, 6 , adopted. James's claim that the Detention Center officials improperly charged him for the medical services is dismissed with prejudice. Duncan is dismissed without prejudice as a defendant. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2015. (jak)
March 26, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/26/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarone L James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Bentley
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaisity Jackson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Reese
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?