Pullam v. Carter et al

Plaintiff: John Evan Pullam
Defendant: David Carter, Allison Huckabee and Rosemary Farmer
Case Number: 3:2015cv00085
Filed: March 30, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pullam's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2016. (jak)
July 18, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Pullam doesn't update his address with the Court by 8/14/2016, then his remaining claims will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
January 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file on or before February 29, 2016, a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 (c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c) (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/29/2016. (jak)
August 18, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file on or before September 20, 2015, a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/18/2015. (jak)
June 23, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Partial Recommendation. Pullam's claims against Carter are dismissed without prejudice. Pullam may proceed with his claims against Farmer and Huckabee. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare summons for Farmer and Huckabee a nd the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the summons, this Order, the Amended Complaint, and the partial recommendation, 9 , on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/23/2015. (jak)
March 31, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/31/2015. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullam v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Evan Pullam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Huckabee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?