Carter v. Duncan et al

Plaintiff: Carl Russell Carter, Jr
Defendant: Brett Duncan, Matthew Hall and Craighead County Jail
Case Number: 3:2015cv00090
Filed: April 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 35 Order of Dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/23/2016. (jak)
October 8, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a free world application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must file, on or before November 9, 2015, a properly completed free world application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/8/2015. (jak)
August 31, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Carter may proceed with his constitutional and ADA claim against Boyd, and all other claims raised in the amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Boyd. The U.S. Marshal is d irected to serve the complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on him without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/31/2015. (jak)
August 7, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Recommended Partial Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff may proceed with his claims against Duncan and Hall. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Duncan and Hall. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. All claims against the Craighead County Jail are dismissed with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/7/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Russell Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?