Turner v. West Memphis City of

Plaintiff: Keya Turner
Defendant: West Memphis City of
Case Number: 3:2015cv00093
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The September 26, 2016, jury trial in Jonesboro, Arkansas, is removed from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/16/2016. (jak)
August 29, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/29/2016. (jak)
December 14, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 16 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Keya Turner's claims for punitive damages and her claims that the City of West Memphis is liable for common-law negligence in the hiring, training, supervision, and retention of Leroy Turner and Arthur Jackson are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/2015. (jak)
November 23, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw. The motion to compel is denied as moot, 10 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/23/2015. (jak)
October 19, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. West Memphis City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keya Turner
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?