Chipman v. Mississippi County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Chipman
Defendant: Mississippi County Sheriff's Department and Dale Cook
Case Number: 3:2015cv00143
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 41 Order, the Court grants defendant Sheriff Cook's 25 Motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff Kimberly Chipman's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/28/2017. (jak)
September 2, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial calendar for the week of September 19, 2016. The Court will issue an Order on motions for summary judgment filed by plaintiff Kimberly Chipman and defendant Dale Cook by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/2/2016. (jak)
December 28, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. The complaint is dismissed against the Mississippi County Sheriff's Department. The claims against Sheriff Dale cook individually and in his official capacity remain pending. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/28/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chipman v. Mississippi County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Chipman
Represented By: Kyle Mayton
Represented By: James McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?