Lewis v. McClung et al
Plaintiff: Mark S Lewis
Defendant: Gerald McClung, Adam Smith, Monty Sanders and Leech
Case Number: 3:2015cv00145
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/16/2015. (jak)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT pursuant to 12 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The action is terminated, and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/28/2015. (jak)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. The Clerk is directed to send the Administrator of the Clay County Detention Center a calculation sheet and a copy of this Order. The Administrator is instructed to complete the form on Plaintiff's behalf and return it to the Court within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/12/2015. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. McClung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McClung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?