Williams v. Morgan et al

Plaintiff: Danny R Williams
Defendant: L Morgan and M Ballard
Case Number: 3:2015cv00165
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/18/2016. (jak)
April 3, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 41 Partial Recommendation. Williams's claims against Jane Doe are dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2016. (jak)
February 19, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Compel. Mr. Williams has thirty days to respond to the Defendants' discovery requests and to complete the medical authorization form. Mr. Williams is specifically cautioned that failure to comply with this Court's order could result in the dismissal of his claims, without prejudice. Defendants are instructed to notify the Court whether Mr. Williams timely responds to this Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/19/2016. (jak)
October 26, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the recommendation, 20 , and overruling Williams's objections, 22 & 23 . Williams's request for criminal charges and his claims about due process, grievance procedures, and legal mail are dismissed without prejudice. His claims against the Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. And his motion for preliminary injunctive relief is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/26/2015. (jak)
October 7, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Morgan, Ballard, Duncan, and Hall. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the complaint, amended complaint with any attachments, and summonses for these Defendants withou t requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Service cannot be effected on Jane Doe because Mr. Williams has not yet identified this Defendants. Mr. Williams has 120 days from the date he filed his complaint to identify and serve this Defendant. The Court will address Mr. Williams's remaining claims in a separate Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/7/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny R Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?