Lung v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Trevor Lung
Defendant: Joey Martin and Poinsett County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2015cv00180
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 2 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The relief requested is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/7/2016. (mcz)
December 11, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file, January 11, 2016: (a) a Statement indicating whether he wishes to continue with this lawsuit; and (b) a properly completed freewor ld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/11/2015. (jak)
November 19, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Recommended Partial Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff Trevor Lung may proceed with his failure to protect and excessive force claim against defendant John Taylor and his inadeq uate medical care claim against defendants Joey Martin and Connie Turner. The Court dismisses without prejudice all other claims against Mr. Martin. The Court dismisses with prejudice all claims against the Poinsett County Detention Center. The Cl erk is directed to prepare a summons for Mr. Martin, Mr. Taylor, and Ms. Turner. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint 2 , amended complaint 6 , and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/19/2015. (jak)
June 30, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a prisoner calculation sheet. Plaintiff must have that form completed by an authorized jail official and return it to the Clerk within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/30/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lung v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Lung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?