Trammel v. Townes et al

Plaintiff: Robert G Trammel
Defendant: W Townes, D Johnson and Northeast Arkansas Community Corrections
Case Number: 3:2015cv00193
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Trammel's claims against Johnson and Towne are dismissed without prejudice. Trammel's claims against the Northeast Arkansas Community Corrections Center are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/11/2016. (thd)
January 4, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a free world application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must file, on or before February 3, 2016, a statement indicating whether he wishes to continue with this lawsuit and a free world application to proceed in forma pauperis. If he does not timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5 (c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/4/2016. (jak)
August 31, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to file a copy of Trammel's initial complaint, 2 , as an exhibit to his amended complaint, 5 , so the two can be read together going forward. Trammel's claims against former warden Johnson are dismissed without p rejudice. All claims against the Northeast Arkansas Community Correction are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare and issue a summons for Defendant Townes. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on Townes without prepayment of fees and costs. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trammel v. Townes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Trammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Townes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Arkansas Community Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?