Ford et al v. CitiMortgage Inc

Plaintiff: Paul Ford and Ann Ford
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc
Movant: Wilson & Associates PLLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00206
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Amended Complaint, 58 , is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/20/2016. (jak)
April 19, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint report on discovery disputes, 44 , addressed. Motion to extend, 52 , granted as modified. Motion to amend, 47 , granted in part and denied in part. Conforming amended complaint due by 6 May 2016. The sooner the better. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/2016. (jak)
December 21, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/21/2015. (jak)
November 20, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion. The ADTPA claim is dismissed with prejudice. The unjust enrichment and conversion claims go forward. Motion to strike class allegations, 4 , and cross-motion for class certification, 17 , denie d without prejudice. Counsel should meet and confer in-person about the Wilson & Associates files. Please do so and file a joint report by 18 December 2015 if a dispute remains. Any proposed protective order should be submitted by that date too. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/20/2015. (jak)
November 2, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Quash with a caveat. Ford may pursue full discovery after the Court addresses the motion to dismiss and the class-related motions. The carried-over motion to quash, 7 , is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2015. (jak)
September 10, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Remand to State Court as untimely. It was filed on the thirty-first day after the notice of removal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/2015. (jak)
July 20, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Motions as to Lucia Nale, Thomas V. Panoff, Joseph M. Callaghan, and Riki S. Tozzi. Signed by State Circuit Court Judge David Laser.(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford et al v. CitiMortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ford
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Ford
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc
Represented By: Joseph M. Callaghan
Represented By: James F. Gramling, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron D. Heller
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: W. Lance Owens
Represented By: Thomas Panoff
Represented By: Rik S. Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Wilson & Associates PLLC
Represented By: Howard Gregory Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?