King v. Roundsville et al

Plaintiff: Tylon Calvin King
Defendant: Rob Roundsville, Luther Whitfield, Clayburn Hicks and Dale Cook
Case Number: 3:2015cv00213
Filed: July 28, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 40 Order, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice with respect to plaintiff Tylon Calvin King's claims regarding his cell toilet, food, and medical care, and with prejudice in all other respects; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/7/2016. (jak)
August 4, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing King an opportunity to file responses in opposition to the motions for summary judgment, 24 $ 32 . To be considered, the responses must be filed within fourteen days of this order's entry date. If King files a response, he must also file a separate short statement setting forth the disputed facts that he believes must be decided at a trial. While King is not required to file a response to the motions for summary judgment, if he does not respond, the Court can assume that the facts set out in the statement of facts, 26 & 34 , are true. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/4/2016. (jak)
March 24, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice of his current mailing address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of his complaint. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to plaintiff at his address of record, as well as at the Grimes Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 3/24/2016. (jak)
August 26, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Defendants Clayburn Hicks and Luther Whitfield, as set forth in their answer, 10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/26/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Roundsville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylon Calvin King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Roundsville
Represented By: Joshua Derek Standerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Whitfield
Represented By: Joshua Derek Standerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayburn Hicks
Represented By: Joshua Derek Standerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cook
Represented By: Joshua Derek Standerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?