Chisem v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Clint B Chisem
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman, Mandy Childress, Marni Dickerson and Mike Allen
Case Number: 3:2015cv00218
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Chisem's claims against Childress and Dickerson for inadequate medical treatment are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2016. (jak)
November 15, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion. The Court vacates its 7/29/2016 32 Order and 33 Judgment. The Court directs the Clerk to reinstate Magistrate Judge Volpe's 6/15/2016 30 Recommendation as a pending motion. The Court will consider the recommendation promptly in light of Chisem's objections, 34 & 37 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2016. (jak)
July 29, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Chisem's claims against Childress and Dickerson for inadequate medical treatment are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2016. (jak)
July 11, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Embedded motion for copies, 29 , granted. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Chisem copies of docket entries 26 - 30 with a copy of this Order. Chisem's objections to the pending recommendation, 30 , due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/2016. (jak)
September 28, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Recommendation. Chisem may proceed with his claim that Childress and Dickerson gave him inadequate medical treatment for his arm, rib, and shoulder injuries. Chisem's other claims against Childress and Dickerson are dismissed without prejudice because those claims are improperly joined in this lawsuit. Chisem's claims against Coleman and Allen are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/2015. (ks)
August 20, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Mandy Childress and Marni Dickerson and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons, amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Service for both Defendants should be through the Crittenden County Jail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/20/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chisem v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint B Chisem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Childress
Represented By: Joshua Derek Standerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marni Dickerson
Represented By: Joshua Derek Standerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?