Arch Specialty Insurance Company v. First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas

Plaintiff: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas
Case Number: 3:2015cv00223
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court congratulates the parties on their settlement and notes the satisfaction, 82 . The 78 Stay is dissolved. The 81 Motion is granted. The Court directs the Clerk to pay the $352,000 in the registry, plus any accrued interest, to First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/2016. (jak)
September 14, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk received the check from the Bank. The Judgment, 62 , is superseded and stayed pending appeal. After receiving the mandate from the Court of Appeals, this Court will disburse the money to implement that mandate. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2016. (jak)
September 13, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Costs. The Court awards the filing fee, the transcript fee, and copy expenses. The Bank therefore owes Arch $1,502.01 in costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/13/2016. (jak)
September 12, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Supplement, 73 , noted. The Bank may deposit the cashiers check into the registry of the Court, instead of going the bond route. The Court directs the Clerk to accept the money, put it in an interest-bearing account, and hold it until further order. The Bank's deadline remains 9/14/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/2016. (jak)
September 9, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court much appreciates Arch's expedited response. The Bank's motion to stay, 65 , is granted and the proposed bond is conditionally approved. The Judgment, 62 , is temporarily stayed. The Bank must file a corrected, completed, and executed bond for $352,000 by 9/14/2016 to supersede the judgment. Otherwise, the temporary stay will expire at 5:00 p.m. that day, and Arch may execute, notwithstanding the Bank's appeal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2016. (jak)
August 23, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Arch Specialty Insurance Company against First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas for $300,000.00 in principal and $44,457.53 in prejudgment interest (9.0% from 12/31/2014 through 8/23/2016), plus costs as the Court may later award on timely motion. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.58%, per annum from today until this Judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/23/2016. (jak)
August 8, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes the Bank's cross-motion and related papers. 54 , 55 & 56 . Consolidated and expedited response therefore due by 8/12/2016. Consolidated and expedited reply due by 8/17/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2016. (jak)
May 31, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Report, 33 , noted. Arch must provide a privilege log by 7 June 2016. Counsel must meet and confer in person by 14 June 2016. If the dispute remains unresolved, the parties must file a supplemental joint report by 17 June 2016. With the supplemental report, Arch must file any withheld documents ex parte and under seal for the Court's review. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/31/2016. (jak)
February 1, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified the agreed motion for a protective order, 15 . The Court appreciates the parties' helpful draft. The Court is concerned about the parties labeling some documents as "sealed". That decision rests with the Court on motion. Please consider a new label. There will be confusion if the Court decides to seal only some sealed documents. Please submit a revised order to chambers by 15 February 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Specialty Insurance Company v. First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance R. Miller(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stanley Dale Smith(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank of Eastern Arkansas
Represented By: Allen Vaughan Hankins
Represented By: Stuart W. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?